This case was last updated from Bradford County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/22/2019 at 08:34:17 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS BRYANT, ERICKA Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/18/2019 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against BRYANT, ERICKA. This case was filed in Bradford County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KREIDER, DAVID P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KREIDER, DAVID P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

BRYANT, KELVIN

BRYANT, ERICKA

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL OF AMERICA I

TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SU

FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PATEL, PRATIK R

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

02/11/2019:ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

01/24/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

SUMMONS ISSUED ERICKA BRYANT

01/24/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED ERICKA BRYANT

SUMMONS ISSUED KELVIN BRYANT AKA KELVIN RENARD BRYANT

01/24/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED KELVIN BRYANT AKA KELVIN RENARD BRYANT

SUMMONS ISSUED FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION

01/24/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION

SUMMONS ISSUED ONEMAIN FINANCIAL OF AMERICA INC

01/24/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED ONEMAIN FINANCIAL OF AMERICA INC

SUMMONS

01/18/2019:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

01/18/2019:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

01/18/2019:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

01/18/2019:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

01/18/2019:SUMMONS

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM

01/18/2019:VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM

Notice of Lis Pendens

01/18/2019:Notice of Lis Pendens

Notice of Filing CERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

01/18/2019:Notice of Filing CERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY: ATTORNEY PATEL

01/18/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY: ATTORNEY PATEL

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

01/18/2019:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

01/18/2019:COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/18/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketANSWER BY DEFENDANT FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ERICKA BRYANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED KELVIN BRYANT AKA KELVIN RENARD BRYANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ONEMAIN FINANCIAL OF AMERICA INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketJudge: KREIDER , DAVID P Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $966.00 Receipt Number M 13420995

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $966.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing CERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY: ATTORNEY PATEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketNOTICE BORROWER'S AND CO-BORROWER'S CONTACT INFORMATION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $966.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketCase 042019CA000033CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ONEMAIN FINANCIAL OF AMERICA INC AST is a litigant

Latest cases where Florida Housing Finance Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PATEL, PRATIK