This case was last updated from Bradford County Courts on 10/01/2022 at 13:32:22 (UTC).

U.s. Bank National Association VS BISCHOFF, ALAN A

Case Summary

On 09/02/2022 U s Bank National Association filed an Other lawsuit against BISCHOFF, ALAN A. This case was filed in Bradford County Courts, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVIS, D TATUM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVIS, D TATUM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.s. Bank National Association

Defendant

BISCHOFF, ALAN A

Keystone Heights, FL 32656

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAGEN, JESSICA JO

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

09/02/2022:SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

09/02/2022:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

09/02/2022:STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/02/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/08/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

09/09/2022:ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketJudge: DAVIS , D TATUM Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number M 13471053

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketCase 042022CC000387CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/2/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAGEN , JESSICA J