This case was last updated from Bradford County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/15/2019 at 14:30:39 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS ADDISON, ANGELA R Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2019 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against ADDISON, ANGELA R. This case was filed in Bradford County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KREIDER, DAVID P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KREIDER, DAVID P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

ADDISON, ANGELA R

ADDISON, SHARLENE ELLINGTON

ADDISON, WAYNE D

Not Classified By Court

ADDISON SR, WAYNE D

ADDISON, SHARLENE E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLARFIELD, STEVEN JAY

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

02/28/2019:ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

02/26/2019:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

02/25/2019:ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED WAYNE D ADDISON

02/22/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED WAYNE D ADDISON

SUMMONS ISSUED ANGELA R ADDISON

02/22/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED ANGELA R ADDISON

SUMMONS ISSUED SHARLENE ELLINGTON ADDISON AKA SHARLENE E ADDISON

02/22/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED SHARLENE ELLINGTON ADDISON AKA SHARLENE E ADDISON

SUMMONS ISSUED WAYNE D ADDISON AKA WAYNE D ADDISON SR

02/22/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED WAYNE D ADDISON AKA WAYNE D ADDISON SR

SUMMONS

02/19/2019:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

02/19/2019:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

02/19/2019:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

02/19/2019:SUMMONS

Notice of Filing CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

02/19/2019:Notice of Filing CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

02/19/2019:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM

02/19/2019:VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/19/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

Notice of Lis Pendens

02/19/2019:Notice of Lis Pendens

COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

02/19/2019:COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/19/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED WAYNE D ADDISON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ANGELA R ADDISON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED SHARLENE ELLINGTON ADDISON AKA SHARLENE E ADDISON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED WAYNE D ADDISON AKA WAYNE D ADDISON SR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketJudge: KREIDER , DAVID P Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $958.00 Receipt Number M 13422176

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $958.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $958.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketCase 042019CA000095CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/19/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Clarfield, Steven Jay