This case was last updated from Bradford County Courts on 02/28/2022 at 05:16:43 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS ROWE, JAMES

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROWE, JAMES. This case was filed in Bradford County Courts, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVIS, D TATUM and D TATUM DAVIS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DAVIS, D TATUM

D TATUM DAVIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

ROWE, JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAGEN, JESSICA JO

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/02/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

08/02/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

08/02/2021:SUMMONS FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

08/02/2021:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION W/IN COURT FILE

08/02/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION W/IN COURT FILE

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 9/15/21 @ 9:30AM ISSUED

08/04/2021:SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 9/15/21 @ 9:30AM ISSUED

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE --CONTINUED TO 11/10/2021 AT 9:30

09/15/2021:ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE --CONTINUED TO 11/10/2021 AT 9:30

ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE TO 12/16/21 2 9:30AM

11/10/2021:ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE TO 12/16/21 2 9:30AM

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

11/29/2021:NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 12/16/2021 09:30; Judge: DAVIS, D TATUM; Docket Type: SMALL CLAIMS PT; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event SMALL CLAIMS PT on 12/16/2021 0930 AM Judge D TATUM DAVIS results Dismissed on 11/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent SMALL CLAIMS PT scheduled on 12/16/2021 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge D TATUM DAVIS presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/10/2021 09:30; Judge: DAVIS, D TATUM; Docket Type: SMALL CLAIMS PT; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE TO 12/16/21 2 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketEvent SMALL CLAIMS PT scheduled on 11/10/2021 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge D TATUM DAVIS presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 09/15/2021 09:30; Judge: DAVIS, D TATUM; Docket Type: SMALL CLAIMS PT; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE --CONTINUED TO 11/10/2021 AT 9:30

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketJudge: DAVIS , D TATUM Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number M 13455627

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION W/IN COURT FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCase 042021SC000326SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/2/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAGEN , JESSICA J