This case was last updated from Bradford County Courts on 09/20/2019 at 15:30:28 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS BORGNER, ANGELA

Case Summary

On 08/27/2019 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BORGNER, ANGELA. This case was filed in Bradford County Courts, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVIS, D TATUM and D TATUM DAVIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Bradford County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bradford County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DAVIS, D TATUM

D TATUM DAVIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

BORGNER, ANGELA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALEY, SARAH CATHERINE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 10/16/19 @ 10AM ISSUED

08/29/2019:SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 10/16/19 @ 10AM ISSUED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

08/27/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION W/IN COURT FILE

08/27/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION W/IN COURT FILE

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

08/27/2019:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

08/27/2019:SUMMONS FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 10/16/19 @ 10AM ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • Event SMALL CLAIMS PT scheduled on 10/16/2019 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge D TATUM DAVIS presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • Judge: DAVIS , D TATUM Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION W/IN COURT FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number M 13429854

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • Case 042019SC000433SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Event Date: 10/16/2019 10:00; Judge: DAVIS, D TATUM; Docket Type: SMALL CLAIMS PT; Location: MX COURTROOM TWO

    Read MoreRead Less