This case was last updated from Bradford County Courts on 09/13/2019 at 13:31:15 (UTC).

STREIB, LISA VS HARDEN, CASEY LEIGHAN

Case Summary

On 08/20/2019 STREIB, LISA filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against HARDEN, CASEY LEIGHAN. This case was filed in Bradford County Courts, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVIS, D TATUM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Bradford County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bradford County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVIS, D TATUM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STREIB, LISA

Defendant

HARDEN, CASEY LEIGHAN

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT

08/29/2019:FINAL JUDGMENT

ANSWER FILED

08/28/2019:ANSWER FILED

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: CASEY HARDEN ON 8/22/19

08/22/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: CASEY HARDEN ON 8/22/19

EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED

08/20/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

08/20/2019:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

RECEIPT

08/20/2019:RECEIPT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: CASEY HARDEN ON 8/22/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Payment received: $195.00 Receipt Number M 13429604

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Case 042019CC000420CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Judge: DAVIS , D TATUM assigned

    Read MoreRead Less