This case was last updated from Bradford County Courts on 02/12/2021 at 15:31:56 (UTC).

STARKE HMA LLC DBA SHANDS STAR VS BAKER, JAMES

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 STARKE HMA LLC DBA SHANDS STAR filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BAKER, JAMES. This case was filed in Bradford County Courts, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVIS, D TATUM and D TATUM DAVIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Bradford County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bradford County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DAVIS, D TATUM

D TATUM DAVIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STARKE HMA LLC DBA SHANDS STAR

Defendant

BAKER, JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY R

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 3/11/21 @ 9AM ISSUED

01/15/2021:SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 3/11/21 @ 9AM ISSUED

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

01/13/2021:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

01/13/2021:SUMMONS FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/13/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/13/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/11/2021 09:00; Judge: DAVIS, D TATUM; Docket Type: SMALL CLAIMS PT; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 3/11/21 @ 9AM ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketEvent SMALL CLAIMS PT scheduled on 3/11/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge D TATUM DAVIS presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketJudge: DAVIS , D TATUM Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number M 13447587

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCase 042021SC000014SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STARKE HMA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R