This case was last updated from Bradford County Courts on 09/23/2019 at 13:30:25 (UTC).

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE VS THOMAS, TRAVON L Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/30/2019 PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE filed an Other lawsuit against THOMAS, TRAVON L. This case was filed in Bradford County Courts, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVIS, D TATUM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Bradford County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bradford County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVIS, D TATUM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE

Defendants

THOMAS, VELESA M

THOMAS, TRAVON L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSON, STEVEN JAY

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: TRAVON THOMAS ON 9/09/19

09/12/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: TRAVON THOMAS ON 9/09/19

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: VELESA THOMAS BY SUBSTITUTE ON 9/09/19

09/12/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: VELESA THOMAS BY SUBSTITUTE ON 9/09/19

SUMMONS ISSUED TO VELESA THOMAS

09/06/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO VELESA THOMAS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO TRAVON THOMAS

09/06/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO TRAVON THOMAS

COMPLAINT

08/30/2019:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/30/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS FOR VELESA THOMAS

08/30/2019:SUMMONS FOR VELESA THOMAS

SUMMONS FOR TRAVON THOMAS

08/30/2019:SUMMONS FOR TRAVON THOMAS

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: TRAVON THOMAS ON 9/09/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: VELESA THOMAS BY SUBSTITUTE ON 9/09/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO VELESA THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO TRAVON THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • Judge: DAVIS , D TATUM Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FOR VELESA THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FOR TRAVON THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • Payment received: $320.00 Receipt Number M 13430039

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $320.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $320.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • Case 042019CC000438CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less