This case was last updated from Bradford County Courts on 10/01/2022 at 15:43:00 (UTC).

Persolve Recoveries, Llc. VS TODD, STEVEN

Case Summary

On 09/02/2022 Persolve Recoveries, Llc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TODD, STEVEN. This case was filed in Bradford County Courts, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVIS, D TATUM and D TATUM DAVIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DAVIS, D TATUM

D TATUM DAVIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Persolve Recoveries, Llc.

Defendant

TODD, STEVEN

Hampton, FL 32044

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLACHER, JEFFREY W

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/02/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY: ATTY FOR PLF

09/02/2022:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY: ATTY FOR PLF

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

09/02/2022:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

09/02/2022:MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

SUMMONS FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

09/02/2022:SUMMONS FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/02/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 11/17/22 @ 9:30AM ISSUED

09/08/2022:SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 11/17/22 @ 9:30AM ISSUED

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED TO: STEVEN TODD

09/27/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED TO: STEVEN TODD

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/17/2022 09:30; Judge: DAVIS, D TATUM; Docket Type: SMALL CLAIMS PT; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COURTR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED TO: STEVEN TODD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 11/17/22 @ 9:30AM ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketEvent SMALL CLAIMS PT scheduled on 11/17/2022 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge D TATUM DAVIS presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketJudge: DAVIS , D TATUM Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number M 13471055

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY: ATTY FOR PLF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketCase 042022SC000389SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/2/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PERSOLVE RECOVERIES LLC AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BRIDGECREST ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLACHER , JEFFREY W