This case was last updated from Bradford County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/09/2019 at 14:30:20 (UTC).

PATEL, PUSHPA VS PATEL, SURESH P Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/16/2019 PATEL, PUSHPA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PATEL, SURESH P. This case was filed in Bradford County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KREIDER, DAVID P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KREIDER, DAVID P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATEL, PUSHPA

Defendants

PATEL, SURESH P

SHIV CRUPA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARTINEZ-MONFORT, LUIS

Defendant Attorney

BULLOCK, STEPHEN CHARLES

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/16/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS

05/16/2019:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

05/16/2019:SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED SHIV CRUPA INC

05/17/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED SHIV CRUPA INC

SUMMONS ISSUED SURESH P PATEL

05/17/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED SURESH P PATEL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/03/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION TO DISMISS

06/03/2019:MOTION TO DISMISS

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: SURESH PATEL

06/04/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: SURESH PATEL

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: SHIV CRUPA/SAM PATEL, REGISTERED AGENT

06/04/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: SHIV CRUPA/SAM PATEL, REGISTERED AGENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: SHIV CRUPA/SAM PATEL, REGISTERED AGENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: SURESH PATEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketJudge: KREIDER , DAVID P Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED SURESH P PATEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED SHIV CRUPA INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number M 13425855

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketCase 042019CA000249CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/16/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martinez-Monfort, Luis