This case was last updated from Bradford County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/09/2022 at 14:32:30 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC VS DAVID L GREEN, UNKNOWN SPOUSE Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2022 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against DAVID L GREEN, UNKNOWN SPOUSE. This case was filed in Bradford County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH and WRIGHT, GEORGE M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH

WRIGHT, GEORGE M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants

GREEN, DAVID L

DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AM

DAVID L GREEN, UNKNOWN SPOUSE

OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY, UNKNO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEWIS, COREY MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/10/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

05/10/2022:COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

Notice of Lis Pendens

05/10/2022:Notice of Lis Pendens

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM CROSSCLAIM/COUNTERPETITION/THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT

05/10/2022:VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM CROSSCLAIM/COUNTERPETITION/THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

05/10/2022:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

Notice of Filing

05/10/2022:Notice of Filing

STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

05/10/2022:STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

SUMMONS

05/10/2022:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

05/10/2022:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

05/10/2022:SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DAVID GREEN

05/16/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DAVID GREEN

SUMMONS ISSUED TO DAVID GREEN

05/16/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO DAVID GREEN

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT

05/16/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT

SUMMONS FOR DEUTSCHE BANK

05/17/2022:SUMMONS FOR DEUTSCHE BANK

SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEUTSCHE BANK

05/18/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEUTSCHE BANK

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketJudge: WRIGHT , GEORGE M Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO DEUTSCHE BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS FOR DEUTSCHE BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO DAVID GREEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DAVID GREEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $958.00 Receipt Number M 13466386

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $958.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM CROSSCLAIM/COUNTERPETITION/THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $958.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketCase 042022CA000190CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/10/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY, UNKNO is a litigant

Latest cases where Deutsche Bank Trust Co is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEWIS COREY