This case was last updated from Bradford County Courts on 07/23/2022 at 13:32:09 (UTC).

N.A.R. INC. AS ASSIGNEE OF MER VS SULLIVAN, JOHN E

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 N A R INC AS ASSIGNEE OF MER filed an Other lawsuit against SULLIVAN, JOHN E. This case was filed in Bradford County Courts, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

N.A.R. INC. AS ASSIGNEE OF MER

Defendant

SULLIVAN, JOHN E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLACHER, JEFFREY W

 

Court Documents

STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

06/23/2022:STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY: POLLACK & ROSEN PA

06/23/2022:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY: POLLACK & ROSEN PA

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

06/23/2022:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS

06/23/2022:SUMMONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/23/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

06/23/2022:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/28/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: JOHN SULLIVAN BY SUBSTITUTE ON 7/12/22

07/16/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: JOHN SULLIVAN BY SUBSTITUTE ON 7/12/22

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: JOHN SULLIVAN BY SUBSTITUTE ON 7/12/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number M 13468254

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY: POLLACK & ROSEN PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCase 042022CC000263CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/23/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where N.A.R. INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLACHER , JEFFREY W