This case was last updated from Bradford County Courts on 06/30/2019 at 15:30:16 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS HAMILTON, ANN E

Case Summary

On 06/06/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HAMILTON, ANN E. This case was filed in Bradford County Courts, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVIS, D TATUM and D TATUM DAVIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Bradford County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bradford County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DAVIS, D TATUM

D TATUM DAVIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

HAMILTON, ANN E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OBI, VALERIA I.

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: ANN HAMILTON ON 6-22-19

06/26/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: ANN HAMILTON ON 6-22-19

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

06/18/2019:ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 7/25/19 @ 10AM ISSUED

06/07/2019:SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 7/25/19 @ 10AM ISSUED

SUMMONS FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

06/06/2019:SUMMONS FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

06/06/2019:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/06/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/06/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: ANN HAMILTON ON 6-22-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 7/25/19 @ 10AM ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Event SMALL CLAIMS PT scheduled on 7/25/2019 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge D TATUM DAVIS presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Judge: DAVIS , D TATUM Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number M 13426735

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Case 042019SC000278SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/6/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Event Date: 07/25/2019 10:00; Judge: DAVIS, D TATUM; Docket Type: SMALL CLAIMS PT; Location: MX COURTROOM TWO

    Read MoreRead Less