This case was last updated from Bradford County Courts on 12/20/2019 at 16:30:58 (UTC).

MATTHEWS, STEPHANIE IRIS VS MATTHEWS, JOSHUA ALLEN JR

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 MATTHEWS, STEPHANIE IRIS filed a Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MATTHEWS, JOSHUA ALLEN JR. This case was filed in Bradford County Courts, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KREIDER, DAVID P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Bradford County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bradford County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KREIDER, DAVID P

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MATTHEWS, STEPHANIE IRIS

Respondent

MATTHEWS, JOSHUA ALLEN JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: JOSHUA MATTHEWS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Judge: KREIDER , DAVID P Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED JOSHUA ALLEN MATTHEWS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • PARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING CHILD SUPPORT GUIDLINES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT SHORT FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • PERMISSION TO USE E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • COPY OF DRIVER'S LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Case 042019DR000639DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/4/2019

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.