This case was last updated from Bradford County Courts on 10/15/2022 at 15:37:14 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS WYMAN, KAREN

Case Summary

On 09/15/2022 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WYMAN, KAREN. This case was filed in Bradford County Courts, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVIS, D TATUM and D TATUM DAVIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DAVIS, D TATUM

D TATUM DAVIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

WYMAN, KAREN

Brooker, FL 32622-3141

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHERR, HAROLD EARL

Defendant Attorney

DRACH, JUSTIN SETH

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/15/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/15/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

09/15/2022:SUMMONS FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 11/17/22 @ 9:30AM ISSUED

09/20/2022:SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 11/17/22 @ 9:30AM ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ATTY JUSTIN DRACH FOR DEF

09/20/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ATTY JUSTIN DRACH FOR DEF

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/17/2022 09:30; Judge: DAVIS, D TATUM; Docket Type: SMALL CLAIMS PT; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COURTR; Defendant Attorney: Drach, Justin Seth

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ATTY JUSTIN DRACH FOR DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 11/17/22 @ 9:30AM ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketEvent SMALL CLAIMS PT scheduled on 11/17/2022 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge D TATUM DAVIS presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketJudge: DAVIS , D TATUM Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number M 13471328

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketCase 042022SC000405SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Drach, Justin Seth