This case was last updated from Bradford County Courts on 10/08/2022 at 13:31:48 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS BLOUNT, JACOB

Case Summary

On 09/09/2022 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed an Other lawsuit against BLOUNT, JACOB. This case was filed in Bradford County Courts, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVIS, D TATUM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVIS, D TATUM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

BLOUNT, JACOB

Starke, FL 32091-5133

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANDERS, TIMOTHY JOHN

Defendant Attorney

WELLS, MARILYN GANTT

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/09/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/09/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY: PLF'S ATTY

09/09/2022:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY: PLF'S ATTY

SUMMONS

09/09/2022:SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

09/09/2022:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

09/09/2022:STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

COMPLAINT

09/09/2022:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/12/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ATTY MARILYN WELLS FRO DEF

09/20/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ATTY MARILYN WELLS FRO DEF

ANSWER

09/20/2022:ANSWER

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: JACOB BLOUNT

10/06/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: JACOB BLOUNT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: JACOB BLOUNT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ATTY MARILYN WELLS FRO DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketJudge: DAVIS , D TATUM Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY: PLF'S ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number M 13471135

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketCase 042022CC000395CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/9/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WELLS , MARILYN G