Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Bradford County on 05/15/2021 at 14:40:27 (UTC).

KNIGHT, NANCY VS EAN HOLDING LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 KNIGHT, NANCY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EAN HOLDING LLC. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Bradford County, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WRIGHT, GEORGE M and WRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Eighth Circuit Courts - Bradford County

  • Courthouse:

    Bradford County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WRIGHT, GEORGE M

WRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KNIGHT, NANCY

Defendants

EAN HOLDING LLC

PROGRESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE

KANE, BRIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

PECKO, MARK ANTOINE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED PROGRESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE CO

04/20/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED PROGRESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE CO

SUMMONS ISSUED EAN HOLDINGS LLC

04/20/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED EAN HOLDINGS LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED BRIAN KANE

04/20/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED BRIAN KANE

COMPLAINT

04/16/2021:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS

04/16/2021:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

04/16/2021:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

04/16/2021:SUMMONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/16/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED PROGRESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED EAN HOLDINGS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BRIAN KANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketJudge: WRIGHT , GEORGE M Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $430.00 Receipt Number M 13451497

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $430.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCase 042021CA000153CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGESSIVE NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where EAN Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pecko, Mark Antoine