This case was last updated from Bradford County Courts on 09/12/2019 at 13:30:53 (UTC).

KEYSTONE AIRPARK AUTHORITY VS WINGS OF DREAMS INC

Case Summary

On 08/19/2019 KEYSTONE AIRPARK AUTHORITY filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against WINGS OF DREAMS INC. This case was filed in Bradford County Courts, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVIS, D TATUM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Bradford County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bradford County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVIS, D TATUM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KEYSTONE AIRPARK AUTHORITY

Defendant

WINGS OF DREAMS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARDWICK, KATELYN TAYLOR

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

08/26/2019:ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED

08/23/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

08/20/2019:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

08/20/2019:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/20/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS

08/20/2019:SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • COMPLAINT (AMENDED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Judge: DAVIS , D TATUM Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Payment received: $195.00 Receipt Number M 13429630

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Case 042019CC000423CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less