This case was last updated from Bradford County Courts on 02/12/2021 at 16:31:32 (UTC).

JOHNSON, JONATHAN BRIAN VS GIBSON, JENNIFER ANN

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 JOHNSON, JONATHAN BRIAN filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against GIBSON, JENNIFER ANN. This case was filed in Bradford County Courts, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WRIGHT, GEORGE M and WRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Bradford County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bradford County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WRIGHT, GEORGE M

WRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOHNSON, JONATHAN BRIAN

Respondent

GIBSON, JENNIFER ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

HERTZ, DARBY FITZGERALD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF PDR COURSE JOHNATHAN B JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketANSWER TO COUNTERPETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $295.00 Receipt Number M 13448286

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 3 Total Assessed $295.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND COUNTERPETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $295.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED JENNIFER ANN GIBSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketPERMISSION TO USE E-MAIL JONATHAN JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number M 13447607

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $300.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $300.00 Balance Remaining $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCase 042021DR000021DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketJudge: WRIGHT , GEORGE M assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERTZ, DARBY