This case was last updated from Bradford County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 12/08/2022 at 14:48:14 (UTC).

JACKSON, BRANDI SHERIE VS DILLON, CANDACE Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/16/2022 JACKSON, BRANDI SHERIE filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against DILLON, CANDACE. This case was filed in Bradford County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH and WRIGHT, GEORGE M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH

WRIGHT, GEORGE M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACKSON, BRANDI SHERIE

Defendants

DILLON, CANDACE

HEARTLAND EXPRESS INC OF IOWA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARRERO, THOMAS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/16/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/16/2022:COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS

11/16/2022:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

11/16/2022:SUMMONS

STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

11/16/2022:STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

SUMMONS ISSUED CANDACE DILLON

11/17/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED CANDACE DILLON

SUMMONS ISSUED HEARTLAND EXPRESS, INC. OF IOWA C/O MANY PINEIRO, AS REGISTER AGENT

11/17/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED HEARTLAND EXPRESS, INC. OF IOWA C/O MANY PINEIRO, AS REGISTER AGENT

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY: ATTORNEY CARRERO

12/02/2022:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY: ATTORNEY CARRERO

NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEF CANDACE DILLON

12/02/2022:NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEF CANDACE DILLON

REQUEST PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEF CANDACE DILLON

12/02/2022:REQUEST PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEF CANDACE DILLON

NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEF HEARTLAND EXPRESS INC OF IOWA

12/02/2022:NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEF HEARTLAND EXPRESS INC OF IOWA

REQUEST PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEF HEARTLAND EXPRESS INC OF IOWA

12/02/2022:REQUEST PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEF HEARTLAND EXPRESS INC OF IOWA

REQUEST PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEF HEARTLAND EXPRESS INC OF IOWA

12/02/2022:REQUEST PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEF HEARTLAND EXPRESS INC OF IOWA

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEF HEARTLAND EXPRESS INC OF IOWA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEF HEARTLAND EXPRESS INC OF IOWA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEF HEARTLAND EXPRESS INC OF IOWA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEF CANDACE DILLON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEF CANDACE DILLON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY: ATTORNEY CARRERO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketJudge: WRIGHT , GEORGE M Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED HEARTLAND EXPRESS, INC. OF IOWA C/O MANY PINEIRO, AS REGISTER AGENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED CANDACE DILLON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number M 13473627

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketCase 042022CA000453CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HEARTLAND EXPRESS INC. OF IOWA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARRERO, THOMAS