This case was last updated from Bradford County Courts on 09/12/2019 at 16:30:55 (UTC).

INSLEE, JAMES D VS MUNDORFF, LUANA L

Case Summary

On 08/19/2019 INSLEE, JAMES D filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MUNDORFF, LUANA L. This case was filed in Bradford County Courts, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KREIDER, DAVID P and DAVID KREIDER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Bradford County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bradford County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KREIDER, DAVID P

DAVID KREIDER

 

Party Details

Petitioner

INSLEE, JAMES D

Respondent

MUNDORFF, LUANA L

Not Classified By Court

MUNDORFF, LUANA LAYNE

INSLEE, JAMES DEWAYNE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • Event CASE MANAGEMENT scheduled on 9/16/2019 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge DAVID KREIDER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • ORDER SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • COPY OF DRIVER'S LICENSE BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • PERMISSION TO USE E-MAIL LUANA MUNDORFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • PERMISSION TO USE E-MAIL JAMES INSLEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • STANDING FAMILY COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Payment received: $408.00 Receipt Number M 13429542

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Case 042019DR000428DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Judge: KREIDER , DAVID P assigned

    Read MoreRead Less