This case was last updated from Bradford County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/30/2022 at 13:41:34 (UTC).

HOLTON, KATELIA VS CIRCLE K STORES INC

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 HOLTON, KATELIA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CIRCLE K STORES INC. This case was filed in Bradford County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KREIDER, DAVID P, DAVID KREIDER, WRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH and WRIGHT, GEORGE M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KREIDER, DAVID P

DAVID KREIDER

WRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH

WRIGHT, GEORGE M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOLTON, KATELIA

Defendant

CIRCLE K STORES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAWK, ABBEY S

Defendant Attorney

WILLIAMS, RYAN KENNETH

 

Court Documents

Notice of Mediation CONFERENCE

01/10/2022:Notice of Mediation CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD

06/18/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD

COMPLAINT

01/04/2019:COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR COPIES

02/24/2022:REQUEST FOR COPIES

REQUEST FOR COPIES

02/18/2022:REQUEST FOR COPIES

MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/07/2022:MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD & DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION

05/09/2019:NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD & DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION

MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR FRAUD UPON THE COURT

12/20/2021:MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR FRAUD UPON THE COURT

REQUEST DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/16/2021:REQUEST DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE NON-PARTY PRODUCTION SUBPOENAS

08/27/2020:ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE NON-PARTY PRODUCTION SUBPOENAS

REQUEST FOR COPIES

08/05/2020:REQUEST FOR COPIES

Notice Of Hearing 8-24-20 @ 2:30 PM

07/09/2020:Notice Of Hearing 8-24-20 @ 2:30 PM

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

06/30/2020:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

Notice Of Hearing 7-1-20 @ 11:45 AM

06/17/2020:Notice Of Hearing 7-1-20 @ 11:45 AM

REQUEST FOR COPIES PER AUTHORIZATION

06/17/2020:REQUEST FOR COPIES PER AUTHORIZATION

REQUEST FOR COPIES PER AUTHORIZATION

06/17/2020:REQUEST FOR COPIES PER AUTHORIZATION

REQUEST FOR COPIES

05/18/2020:REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION(S) (AMENDED RE-NOTICE)

04/07/2020:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION(S) (AMENDED RE-NOTICE)

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE DEFENDANTS CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE DEFENDANTS CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Mediation CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED CIRCLE K STORES INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PROPOUNDING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number M 13420378

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketCase 042019CA000006CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/4/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Circle K Stores Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hawk, Abbey S