This case was last updated from Bradford County Courts on 09/21/2021 at 10:14:18 (UTC).

HALL, PATRICK MICHAEL VS DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE STATE OF Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/03/2021 HALL, PATRICK MICHAEL filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE STATE OF. This case was filed in Bradford County Courts, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH and WRIGHT, GEORGE M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH

WRIGHT, GEORGE M

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HALL, PATRICK MICHAEL

Respondents

WRIGHT, ANGELA

DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE STATE OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WELLER, THOMAS RAY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketANSWER FILED BY ANGELA WRIGHT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ANGELA WRIGHT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketJudge: WRIGHT , GEORGE M Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $320.00 Receipt Number M 13455664

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $320.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketPetition for Paternity

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $320.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCase 042021DR000286DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/3/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WELLER, THOMAS RAY