This case was last updated from Bradford County Courts on 09/16/2019 at 13:30:56 (UTC).

GEORGE F ALLEN INC VS BRABHAM, GERTERRICA

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 GEORGE F ALLEN INC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against BRABHAM, GERTERRICA. This case was filed in Bradford County Courts, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVIS, D TATUM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Bradford County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bradford County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVIS, D TATUM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GEORGE F ALLEN INC

Defendant

BRABHAM, GERTERRICA

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: GERTERRICA BRABHAM (POSTED) ON 9/09/19

09/11/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: GERTERRICA BRABHAM (POSTED) ON 9/09/19

RETURNED MAIL FOR GERTERRICA BRABHAM

08/29/2019:RETURNED MAIL FOR GERTERRICA BRABHAM

CERTIFED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT SIGNED FOR ON 8/26/19

08/29/2019:CERTIFED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT SIGNED FOR ON 8/26/19

PROOF OF CERTIFIED MAILING TO HOME ADDRESS

08/23/2019:PROOF OF CERTIFIED MAILING TO HOME ADDRESS

EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED

08/23/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION ON COMMERCIAL PROPERTY

08/23/2019:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION ON COMMERCIAL PROPERTY

RECEIPT

08/23/2019:RECEIPT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: GERTERRICA BRABHAM (POSTED) ON 9/09/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL FOR GERTERRICA BRABHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT SIGNED FOR ON 8/26/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF CERTIFIED MAILING TO HOME ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION ON COMMERCIAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Payment received: $202.50 Receipt Number M 13429729

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $202.50 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $202.50 Balance Remaining $202.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Case 042019CC000428CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Judge: DAVIS , D TATUM assigned

    Read MoreRead Less