This case was last updated from Bradford County Courts on 02/28/2022 at 05:23:35 (UTC).

FORD, DIANE LOUISE, GILLYARD, TRICIA LEE Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/03/2021 FORD, DIANE LOUISE, GILLYARD, TRICIA LEE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Bradford County Courts, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WRIGHT, GEORGE M and WRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WRIGHT, GEORGE M

WRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GILLYARD, TRICIA LEE

Decedent

FORD, DIANE LOUISE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WILSON, DALE STEWART

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS (9/16/21)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketLetters of Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION W/IN COURT FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketJudge: WRIGHT , GEORGE M Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number M 13455665

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDeath Certificate OF DIANE FORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCase 042021CP000098CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/3/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DALE WILSON