This case was last updated from Bradford County Courts on 09/07/2019 at 13:31:19 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS KYLE, MARY A

Case Summary

On 08/14/2019 DISCOVER BANK filed an Other lawsuit against KYLE, MARY A. This case was filed in Bradford County Courts, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVIS, D TATUM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Bradford County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bradford County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVIS, D TATUM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

KYLE, MARY A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHARLET, CHRISTINA N.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/16/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS

08/14/2019:SUMMONS

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

08/14/2019:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/14/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Judge: DAVIS , D TATUM Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number M 13429415

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • Case 042019CC000416CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less