This case was last updated from Bradford County Courts on 09/22/2019 at 13:32:52 (UTC).

CSMT BLT LLC VS KNIGHT, SHARON Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/29/2019 CSMT BLT LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against KNIGHT, SHARON. This case was filed in Bradford County Courts, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVIS, D TATUM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Bradford County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bradford County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVIS, D TATUM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CSMT BLT LLC

Defendants

KNIGHT, SHARON

UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIPPMAN, MARK R.

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

09/12/2019:ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

09/11/2019:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO UNKNOWN TENANT(S)

09/09/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO UNKNOWN TENANT(S)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO SHARON KNIGHT

09/09/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO SHARON KNIGHT

EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANTS

09/06/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANTS

EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO SHARON KNIGHT

09/06/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO SHARON KNIGHT

SUMMONS FOR UNKNOWN TENANT

09/02/2019:SUMMONS FOR UNKNOWN TENANT

SUMMONS FOR SHARON KNIGHT

09/02/2019:SUMMONS FOR SHARON KNIGHT

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

09/02/2019:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/02/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO UNKNOWN TENANT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO SHARON KNIGHT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO SHARON KNIGHT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • Judge: DAVIS , D TATUM Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • Payment received: $205.00 Receipt Number M 13430059

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $205.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FOR UNKNOWN TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FOR SHARON KNIGHT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • Case 042019CC000440CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less