This case was last updated from Bradford County Courts on 09/08/2019 at 13:31:02 (UTC).

CRUM, OLIVER SR VS CUMMINGS, LEON

Case Summary

On 08/15/2019 CRUM, OLIVER SR filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against CUMMINGS, LEON. This case was filed in Bradford County Courts, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVIS, D TATUM and D TATUM DAVIS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Bradford County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bradford County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DAVIS, D TATUM

D TATUM DAVIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRUM, OLIVER SR

Defendant

CUMMINGS, LEON

 

Court Documents

HEARING DISPOSITION FORM

09/05/2019:HEARING DISPOSITION FORM

FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION & DEPOSIT FUND IN THE REGISTRY OF $600 BY 9/10/19

09/05/2019:FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION & DEPOSIT FUND IN THE REGISTRY OF $600 BY 9/10/19

ORDER FOR RELEASE OF REGISTRY FUNDS

09/05/2019:ORDER FOR RELEASE OF REGISTRY FUNDS

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: LEONARD CUMMINGS ON 8/17/19

08/20/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: LEONARD CUMMINGS ON 8/17/19

ORDER SETTING HEARING ON 9/05/19 @ 10:15AM

08/20/2019:ORDER SETTING HEARING ON 9/05/19 @ 10:15AM

ANSWER FILED & RENT DEPOSITED IN THE AMOUNT OF $800

08/20/2019:ANSWER FILED & RENT DEPOSITED IN THE AMOUNT OF $800

RECEIPT

08/20/2019:RECEIPT

EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED

08/15/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

08/15/2019:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

RECEIPT

08/15/2019:RECEIPT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HEARING DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION & DEPOSIT FUND IN THE REGISTRY OF $600 BY 9/10/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR RELEASE OF REGISTRY FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Event HEARING scheduled on 9/5/2019 at 1015 AM, MX - Judge D TATUM DAVIS presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: LEONARD CUMMINGS ON 8/17/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SETTING HEARING ON 9/05/19 @ 10:15AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED & RENT DEPOSITED IN THE AMOUNT OF $800

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Payment received: $819.50 Receipt Number M 13429602

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Payment received: $195.00 Receipt Number M 13429402

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Case 042019CC000414CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Judge: DAVIS , D TATUM assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • Event Date: 09/05/2019 10:15; Judge: DAVIS, D TATUM; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: MX CHAMBERS 237

    Read MoreRead Less