This case was last updated from Bradford County Courts on 09/09/2019 at 13:30:58 (UTC).

CLERK OF COURT FOR BRADFORD CO VS HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/16/2019 CLERK OF COURT FOR BRADFORD CO filed an Other lawsuit against HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Bradford County Courts, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVIS, D TATUM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Bradford County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bradford County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVIS, D TATUM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLERK OF COURT FOR BRADFORD CO

Defendants

THORNTON, LESLEY A

HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALKER, TRAVIS RICHARD

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

09/06/2019:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC ON 8/26/19

08/28/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC ON 8/26/19

SUMMONS ISSUED TO HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC

08/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC

SUMMONS ISSUED TO LESSLEY THORNTON

08/16/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO LESSLEY THORNTON

SUMMONS FOR LESSLEY THORNTON

08/16/2019:SUMMONS FOR LESSLEY THORNTON

SUMMONS FOR HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC

08/16/2019:SUMMONS FOR HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC ON 8/26/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO LESSLEY THORNTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Judge: DAVIS , D TATUM Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FOR LESSLEY THORNTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FOR HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Payment received: $320.00 Receipt Number M 13429506

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $320.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $320.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Case 042019CC000419CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less