This case was last updated from Bradford County Courts on 10/04/2022 at 13:40:34 (UTC).

CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION VS MILLER, JAMIE LYNN

Case Summary

On 09/07/2022 CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION filed a Property - Repossession lawsuit against MILLER, JAMIE LYNN. This case was filed in Bradford County Courts, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVIS, D TATUM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Repossession

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVIS, D TATUM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION

Defendant

MILLER, JAMIE LYNN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/14/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

REPLEVIN COMPLAINT

09/14/2022:REPLEVIN COMPLAINT

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY: PLF'S ATTY

09/14/2022:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY: PLF'S ATTY

MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE A WRIT OF PREJUDGMENT WRIT OF REPLEVINE & FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY

09/14/2022:MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE A WRIT OF PREJUDGMENT WRIT OF REPLEVINE & FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY

SUMMONS

09/14/2022:SUMMONS

Notice of Filing PROPOSED BOND & PREJUDGMENT WRIT OF REPLEVIN

09/14/2022:Notice of Filing PROPOSED BOND & PREJUDGMENT WRIT OF REPLEVIN

MOTION FOR ORDER REQUIRING SHERIFF TO ENTER LOCKED PREMISES

09/14/2022:MOTION FOR ORDER REQUIRING SHERIFF TO ENTER LOCKED PREMISES

STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

09/14/2022:STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

COVER LETTER

09/19/2022:COVER LETTER

REPLEVIN BOND (APPROVED) (ORIGINAL)

09/19/2022:REPLEVIN BOND (APPROVED) (ORIGINAL)

RECEIPT

09/19/2022:RECEIPT

ORDER AUTHORIZING SHERIFF TO ENTER LOCKED PREMISES

09/19/2022:ORDER AUTHORIZING SHERIFF TO ENTER LOCKED PREMISES

ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE A WRIT OF PREJUDGMENT WRIT OF REPLEVIN & FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY

09/19/2022:ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE A WRIT OF PREJUDGMENT WRIT OF REPLEVIN & FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/19/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

Notice of Filing PRE-JUDGEMENT WRIT OF REPLEVIN

09/20/2022:Notice of Filing PRE-JUDGEMENT WRIT OF REPLEVIN

WRIT OF REPLEVIN (PRE-JUDGMENT)

09/21/2022:WRIT OF REPLEVIN (PRE-JUDGMENT)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF REPLEVIN (PRE-JUDGMENT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing PRE-JUDGEMENT WRIT OF REPLEVIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE A WRIT OF PREJUDGMENT WRIT OF REPLEVIN & FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER AUTHORIZING SHERIFF TO ENTER LOCKED PREMISES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $495.00 Receipt Number M 13471503

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $495.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $8.50 Receipt Number M 13471502

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $8.50 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketJudge: DAVIS , D TATUM Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ORDER REQUIRING SHERIFF TO ENTER LOCKED PREMISES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing PROPOSED BOND & PREJUDGMENT WRIT OF REPLEVIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE A WRIT OF PREJUDGMENT WRIT OF REPLEVINE & FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY: PLF'S ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLEVIN COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketCase 042022CC000400CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/7/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAMPUS USA CREDIT UNION is a litigant