This case was last updated from Bradford County Courts on 10/01/2022 at 16:34:09 (UTC).

BUCHBERGER, KRISTINA VS BUCHBERGER, BENJAMIN

Case Summary

On 09/06/2022 BUCHBERGER, KRISTINA filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against BUCHBERGER, BENJAMIN. This case was filed in Bradford County Courts, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGE WRIGHT, WRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH and WRIGHT, GEORGE M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GEORGE WRIGHT

WRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH

WRIGHT, GEORGE M

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BUCHBERGER, KRISTINA

Respondent

BUCHBERGER, BENJAMIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BERNIER, ALEX JOHN

Respondent Attorney

SIKES, CHARLES DANIEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketRECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketEvent INJUNCTION HEARING scheduled on 10/10/2022 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge GEORGE WRIGHT presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketSHERIFFS RETURN UNSERVED BENJAMIN BUCHBERGER CAME TO BRADFORD COUNTY SHERIFF TO BE SERVED THE TEMPORARY INJUNCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketRECEIPT FROM SHERIFF FOR ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY INJUNCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY INJUNCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketEvent INJUNCTION HEARING scheduled on 9/27/2022 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge GEORGE WRIGHT presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketMOTION TO CONTINUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR RESPONDENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketRECEIPT FROM BRADFORD COUNTY SHERIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketFAX TEMPORARY INJUNCTION TO ALACHUA COUNTY ALONG WITH OTHER ATTACHMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketEvent INJUNCTION HEARING scheduled on 9/12/2022 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge GEORGE WRIGHT presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketPETITIONER'S WAIVER OR NON-WAIVER OF RETURN HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketSERVICE INFO FOR INJUNCTIONS FOR PROTECTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCase 042022DR000356DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/6/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketJudge: WRIGHT , GEORGE M assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIKES, CHARLES DANIEL