This case was last updated from Bradford County Courts on 07/07/2019 13:33:03

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/13/2019 a Property - Other Eviction case was filed by BRIDWELL, DONALD against BUTLER, EBONY in the jurisdiction of Bradford County Courts, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number ****************AXMX
  • Filing Date 06/13/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Property - Other Eviction
  • Jurisdiction Bradford County Courts
  • Judge DAVIS, D TATUM
  • Courthouse Bradford County Courthouse
  • County Bradford
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Plaintiff BRIDWELL, DONALD
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant BUTLER, EBONY
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION

07/03/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION

Free with Subscription
RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: EBONY BUTLER BY SUBSTITUTE ON 6...

06/19/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: EBONY BUTLER BY SUBS...

Free with Subscription
RECEIPT

06/13/2019:RECEIPT

Free with Subscription
ORDER TO DEPOSIT FUNDS IN REGISTRY OF COURT IN THE AMOUNT OF...

06/25/2019:ORDER TO DEPOSIT FUNDS IN REGISTRY OF COURT IN TH...

Free with Subscription
MTN FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

07/03/2019:MTN FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

Free with Subscription
MTN FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST DEF

07/03/2019:MTN FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST DEF

Free with Subscription

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION
  • 07/03/2019
  • MTN FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT
  • 07/03/2019
  • MTN FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST DEF
  • 06/25/2019
  • ORDER TO DEPOSIT FUNDS IN REGISTRY OF COURT IN THE AMOUNT OF $825 WITHIN (7) CALENDAR DAYS
  • 06/24/2019
  • ANSWER FILED
  • 06/19/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: EBONY BUTLER BY SUBSTITUTE ON 6/17/19
  • 06/13/2019
  • RECEIPT
  • 06/13/2019
  • Payment received: $195.00 Receipt Number M 13427017
  • 06/13/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00
  • 06/13/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00
  • 06/13/2019
  • COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION
  • 06/13/2019
  • EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED
  • 06/13/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00
  • 06/13/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00
  • 06/13/2019
  • Case 042019CC000302CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/13/2019
  • 06/13/2019
  • Judge: DAVIS , D TATUM assigned

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.