This case was last updated from Bradford County Courts on 10/12/2022 at 16:33:25 (UTC).

BETTERSON-SMITH, DALICE JUANIT VS STATE OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 09/12/2022 BETTERSON-SMITH, DALICE JUANIT filed an Other - Name Change lawsuit against STATE OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in Bradford County Courts, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH, WRIGHT, GEORGE M and GEORGE WRIGHT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH

WRIGHT, GEORGE M

GEORGE WRIGHT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BETTERSON-SMITH, DALICE JUANIT

Respondent

STATE OF FLORIDA

Not Classified By Court

BETTERSON, DALICE JUANITA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 11/21/2022 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge GEORGE WRIGHT presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING NOVEMBER 21, 2022 AT 10AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVER'S LICENSE PETITIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketPetition FOR CHANGE OF NAME (ADULT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketPERMISSION TO USE E-MAIL DALICE BETTERSON-SMITH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED/DISCLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketRECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $415.00 Receipt Number M 13471155

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $15.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $15.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketCase 042022DR000361DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketJudge: WRIGHT , GEORGE M assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less