This case was last updated from Bradford County Courts on 02/28/2022 at 05:22:41 (UTC).

BENNER, ANN, SUTTON, DONALD Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/03/2021 BENNER, ANN, SUTTON, DONALD was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Bradford County Courts, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH and WRIGHT, GEORGE M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WRIGHT, GEORGE MICAH

WRIGHT, GEORGE M

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BENNER, ANN

Decedent

SUTTON, DONALD

Interested Party

SUTTON, DONNIE JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SANDERS, MEREDITH PAUL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketPetition TO OPEN SAFE DEPOSIT BOX FILED BY DONALD SUTTON JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketLETTER FROM DONNIE SUTTON JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Filing MARRIAGE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDeath Certificate OF NORMA SUTTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDeath Certificate OF DONALD SUTTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketJudge: WRIGHT , GEORGE M Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketPetition TO DETERMINE BENEFICIARIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketPetition for Summary Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number M 13455658

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $345.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCase 042021CP000095CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/3/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2010
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT DATED 7/12/99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2010
  • DocketRECEIPT OF LAST WILL & TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANDERS, MEREDITH PAUL