This case was last updated from Bradford County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/14/2019 at 14:31:00 (UTC).

BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC VS BEN ELLIOTT IF ANY, THE UNKNOW Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2019 BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against BEN ELLIOTT IF ANY, THE UNKNOW. This case was filed in Bradford County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KREIDER, DAVID P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KREIDER, DAVID P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC

Defendants

RIVER ROAD PLANTATION ASSOCIAT

PERSON IN POSSESSION, JOHN DOE

ELLIOTT, BEN ARTHUR III

BEN ELLIOTT IF ANY, THE UNKNOW

Not Classified By Court

ELLIOTT, BEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDEL, DANIEL S

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/18/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/18/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM

02/18/2019:VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM

Notice of Lis Pendens

02/18/2019:Notice of Lis Pendens

COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

02/18/2019:COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

SUMMONS

02/18/2019:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

02/18/2019:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

02/18/2019:SUMMONS

SUMMONS

02/18/2019:SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED BEN ARTHUR ELLIOTT III AKA BEN ELLIOTT

02/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED BEN ARTHUR ELLIOTT III AKA BEN ELLIOTT

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BEN ARTHUR ELLIOTT III

02/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BEN ARTHUR ELLIOTT III

SUMMONS ISSUED JOHN DOE

02/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED JOHN DOE

SUMMONS ISSUED RIVER ROAD PLANTATION ASSOCIATION, INC

02/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED RIVER ROAD PLANTATION ASSOCIATION, INC

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

02/21/2019:MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

02/28/2019:ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED RIVER ROAD PLANTATION ASSOCIATION, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED JOHN DOE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BEN ARTHUR ELLIOTT III

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BEN ARTHUR ELLIOTT III AKA BEN ELLIOTT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketJudge: KREIDER , DAVID P Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $956.00 Receipt Number M 13422090

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $956.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $956.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketCase 042019CA000090CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bayview Loan Servicing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mandel, Daniel S