This case was last updated from Bradford County Courts on 10/01/2022 at 13:32:14 (UTC).

Associates Realty Services VS MONTES, KYLE A Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/02/2022 Associates Realty Services filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MONTES, KYLE A. This case was filed in Bradford County Courts, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVIS, D TATUM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVIS, D TATUM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Associates Realty Services

Defendants

MONTES, KYLE A

SIMMONS, TIFFANI M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARTIN, ELIZABETH A

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION (SIGNED)

09/30/2022:WRIT OF POSSESSION (SIGNED)

WRIT OF POSSESSION (UNSIGNED)

09/27/2022:WRIT OF POSSESSION (UNSIGNED)

FINAL JUDGMENT

09/27/2022:FINAL JUDGMENT

DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST DEFS

09/26/2022:DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST DEFS

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

09/21/2022:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR TIFFANI SIMMONS

09/21/2022:NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR TIFFANI SIMMONS

NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR KYLE MONTES

09/21/2022:NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR KYLE MONTES

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: KYLE MONTES BY SUBSTITUTE ON 9/12/22

09/23/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: KYLE MONTES BY SUBSTITUTE ON 9/12/22

DEFAULT (UNSIGNED)

09/21/2022:DEFAULT (UNSIGNED)

MTN FOR DEFAULT

09/21/2022:MTN FOR DEFAULT

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: TIFFANI SIMMONS ON 9/12/22

09/21/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: TIFFANI SIMMONS ON 9/12/22

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO KYLE MONTES

09/14/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO KYLE MONTES

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO TIFFANI SIMMONS

09/14/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TO TIFFANI SIMMONS

EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO KYLE MONTES

09/08/2022:EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO KYLE MONTES

EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO TIFFANI SIMMONS

09/08/2022:EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED TO TIFFANI SIMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

09/02/2022:COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

SUMMONS FOR KYLE MONTES

09/02/2022:SUMMONS FOR KYLE MONTES

SUMMONS FOR TIFFANI SIMMONS

09/02/2022:SUMMONS FOR TIFFANI SIMMONS

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION (SIGNED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION (UNSIGNED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST DEFS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO: KYLE MONTES BY SUBSTITUTE ON 9/12/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR TIFFANI SIMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR KYLE MONTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT (UNSIGNED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketJudge: DAVIS , D TATUM Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $205.00 Receipt Number M 13471052

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $205.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS FOR KYLE MONTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS FOR TIFFANI SIMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY: ATTY FOR PLF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $205.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketCase 042022CC000386CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/2/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASSOCIATES REALTY SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTIN, ELIZABETH A