This case was last updated from Bradford County Courts on 12/20/2019 at 16:31:26 (UTC).

ACTA, ASHLEY MICHELLE VS ACTA, WILTON ROBERT

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 ACTA, ASHLEY MICHELLE filed a Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ACTA, WILTON ROBERT. This case was filed in Bradford County Courts, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KREIDER, DAVID P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Bradford County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bradford County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KREIDER, DAVID P

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ACTA, ASHLEY MICHELLE

Respondent

ACTA, WILTON ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

TOMSHINSKY, SABINA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Filing RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED: WLITON ROBERT ACTA DEC 11, 2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED WILTON ROBERT ACTA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJudge: KREIDER , DAVID P Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $418.00 Receipt Number M 13433740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $418.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF STANDARD FAMILY LAW INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY: ATTORNEY TOMSHINSKY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Filing COPY OF WIFE'S D/L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCase 042019DR000648DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/4/2019

    Read MoreRead Less