This case was last updated from Bradford County Courts on 10/15/2022 at 13:30:58 (UTC).

19061913 LLC VS GOLDEN, BEVERLY M

Case Summary

On 09/16/2022 19061913 LLC filed an Other lawsuit against GOLDEN, BEVERLY M. This case was filed in Bradford County Courts, Bradford County Courthouse located in Bradford, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVIS, D TATUM and D TATUM DAVIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Bradford, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DAVIS, D TATUM

D TATUM DAVIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

19061913 LLC

Defendant

GOLDEN, BEVERLY M

Not Classified By Court

GOLDEN, BEVERLY MYERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

HATCH, RICHARD SUMNER

 

Court Documents

RECEIPT

09/16/2022:RECEIPT

COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

09/16/2022:COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/16/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ATTY RICHARD HATCH

09/27/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ATTY RICHARD HATCH

ANSWER & MTN TO DISMISS

09/27/2022:ANSWER & MTN TO DISMISS

ORDER SETTING HEARING ON 10/13/22 @ 12:15AM

10/03/2022:ORDER SETTING HEARING ON 10/13/22 @ 12:15AM

Notice of Filing DEF'S WITNESS LIST & DEFENSE EXHIBITS

10/10/2022:Notice of Filing DEF'S WITNESS LIST & DEFENSE EXHIBITS

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 10/13/2022 12:15; Judge: DAVIS, D TATUM; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE CHAMBE; Defendant Attorney: Hatch, Richard Sumner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketJUDGE'S NOTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 10/13/2022 at 1215 PM, MX - Judge D TATUM DAVIS presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing DEF'S WITNESS LIST & DEFENSE EXHIBITS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING ON 10/13/22 @ 12:15PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & MTN TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ATTY RICHARD HATCH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number M 13471439

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketCase 042022CC000410CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketJudge: DAVIS , D TATUM assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HATCH, RICHARD SUMNER