This case was last updated from Baker County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 10/27/2022 at 17:03:16 (UTC).

ROBINSON, JONATHAN MARCUS VS SCOTT, HEATHER NICOLE

Case Summary

On 09/27/2022 ROBINSON, JONATHAN MARCUS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SCOTT, HEATHER NICOLE. This case was filed in Baker County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Baker County Courthouse located in Baker, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALKER, GLORIMIL ROSARIO and WALKER, GLORIA R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Baker, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALKER, GLORIMIL ROSARIO

WALKER, GLORIA R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBINSON, JONATHAN MARCUS

Defendant

SCOTT, HEATHER NICOLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YOUNGBLOOD, MARIA PEREZ

 

Court Documents

STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

09/28/2022:STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number MX 2022004241

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketJudge: WALKER , GLORIA R Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED HEATHER NICOLE SCOTT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketSworn Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCase 022022CA000097CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Youngblood, Maria Perez