This case was last updated from Baker County Courts on 02/04/2021 at 17:02:00 (UTC).

PAIGE, TONYA VS THOMAS, JAMES MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 07/21/2020 PAIGE, TONYA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against THOMAS, JAMES MICHAEL. This case was filed in Baker County Courts, Baker County Courthouse located in Baker, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JOSEPH WILLIAMS, WILLIAMS, JOSEPH MICHAEL and WILLIAMS, JOSEPH M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Baker, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JOSEPH WILLIAMS

WILLIAMS, JOSEPH MICHAEL

WILLIAMS, JOSEPH M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAIGE, TONYA

Defendant

THOMAS, JAMES MICHAEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketFinal Judgment FOR PLAINTIFF- #202100000673

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/20/2021 09:00; Judge: WILLIAMS, JOSEPH M; Docket Type: Hearing Civil; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketEvent Hearing Civil scheduled on 1/20/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge JOSEPH WILLIAMS presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketNOTICE SETTING REMOTE HEARING- WEDNESDAY JANUARY 20 2021 AT 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketNOTICE SETTING REMOTE HEARING- WEDNESDAY JANUARY 20 2021 AT 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 09/01/2020 10:15; Judge: WILLIAMS, JOSEPH M; Docket Type: PreTrial - SC; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketEXHBITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - EXECUTED- JAMES MICHAEL THOMAS- 08/12/2020 AT 12:25 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketNOTICE CHANGING IN-PERSON HEARING TO REMOTE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketActive Process SUMMON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketEvent Time Changed:PreTrial - SC set for 9/1/2020 at 1015 AM in MX with Judge JOSEPH WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketEvent PreTrial - SC scheduled on 9/1/2020 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge JOSEPH WILLIAMS presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2020003097

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketCase 022020SC000214SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketJudge: WILLIAMS , JOSEPH M assigned

    Read MoreRead Less