This case was last updated from Baker County Courts on 02/09/2021 at 13:52:25 (UTC).

PADGETT, WILLIAM RUSSELL VS PADGETT, JENNIFER GAIL

Case Summary

On 02/28/2020 PADGETT, WILLIAM RUSSELL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PADGETT, JENNIFER GAIL. This case was filed in Baker County Courts, Baker County Courthouse located in Baker, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALKER, GLORIMIL ROSARIO, GLORIA WALKER and WALKER, GLORIA R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Baker, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALKER, GLORIMIL ROSARIO

GLORIA WALKER

WALKER, GLORIA R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PADGETT, WILLIAM RUSSELL

Respondent

PADGETT, JENNIFER GAIL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketORDER FOR HEARING TO PROCEED BY VIDEO CONFERENCE ON 05/21/2020 AT 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketEvent Time Changed:Family Court set for 5/21/2020 at 0100 PM in MX with Judge GLORIA WALKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketEvent Court - Family scheduled on 5/21/2020 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge GLORIA WALKER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING ON 05/21/2020 AT 1:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT HUSBAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT WIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketHUSBAND/WIFE PROOF OF IDENTITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number MX 2020001145

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketCase 022020DR000078DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketJudge: WALKER , GLORIA R assigned

    Read MoreRead Less