This case was last updated from Baker County Courts on 02/09/2021 at 14:32:35 (UTC).

JOHNS, WILMA DOREEN VS JOHNS, WILLIAM DAVID II

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 JOHNS, WILMA DOREEN filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against JOHNS, WILLIAM DAVID II. This case was filed in Baker County Courts, Baker County Courthouse located in Baker, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALKER, GLORIMIL ROSARIO, GLORIA WALKER, WALKER, GLORIA R and JOSEPH WILLIAMS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Baker, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALKER, GLORIMIL ROSARIO

GLORIA WALKER

WALKER, GLORIA R

JOSEPH WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOHNS, WILMA DOREEN

Respondent

JOHNS, WILLIAM DAVID II

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL OF TEMPORARY INJUNCTION - INSTRUMENT #202000004448

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - UNEXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketEvent HEARING - INJUNCTION scheduled on 7/16/2020 at 0200 PM, MX - Judge GLORIA WALKER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event HEARING - INJUNCTION on 7/23/2020 1000 AM Judge GLORIA WALKER results CONTINUED on 7/1/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - NOT FOUND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - UNEXECUTED - NOT FOUND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketEvent HEARING - INJUNCTION scheduled on 7/23/2020 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge GLORIA WALKER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketEvent HEARING - INJUNCTION scheduled on 6/10/2020 at 1030 AM, MX - Judge JOSEPH WILLIAMS presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketEvent HEARING - INJUNCTION scheduled on 6/4/2020 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge GLORIA WALKER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketSERVICE INFORMATION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketPETITIONER'S WAIVER OR NON WAIVER OF RETURN HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCase 022020DR000155DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketJudge: WALKER , GLORIA R assigned

    Read MoreRead Less