This case was last updated from Baker County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 10/27/2022 at 17:03:26 (UTC).

FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION VS CYPRESS POINTE OF MACCLENNY HO Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2022 FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CYPRESS POINTE OF MACCLENNY HO. This case was filed in Baker County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Baker County Courthouse located in Baker, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASON, JODI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Baker, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASON, JODI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION

Defendants

CYPRESS POINTE OF MACCLENNY HO

MOORE, JAMBE M

MOORE, BRANDI

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JAMBE M MOO

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION O

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAEED, AAMIR HAYAT

 

Court Documents

STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

09/27/2022:STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

SUMMONS ISSUED BRANDI MOORE

09/27/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED BRANDI MOORE

SUMMONS ISSUED UNK SPOUSE OF JAMBE M MOORE

09/27/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED UNK SPOUSE OF JAMBE M MOORE

SUMMONS ISSUED CYPRESS POINTE OF MACCLENNY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

09/27/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED CYPRESS POINTE OF MACCLENNY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

SUMMONS ISSUED UNK TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

09/27/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED UNK TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLETE SERVICE OF PROCESS OR ALTERNATIVELY PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $965.00 Receipt Number MX 2022004240

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $965.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $965.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketJudge: CASON , JODI Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING- CERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE (ELECTRONIC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNK TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED CYPRESS POINTE OF MACCLENNY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNK SPOUSE OF JAMBE M MOORE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED BRANDI MOORE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED JAMBE M MOORE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS- #202200006402

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketOther

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCase 022022CA000098CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Freedom Mortgage Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Saeed Aamir, Esq