This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Baker County on 06/18/2019 at 16:00:35 (UTC).

FIDELITY BANK DBA FIDELITY BAN VS JAMES D CRUMMEY AKA JAMES DAVI Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2019 FIDELITY BANK DBA FIDELITY BAN filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against JAMES D CRUMMEY AKA JAMES DAVI. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Baker County, Baker County Courthouse located in Baker, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASON, JODI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Eighth Circuit Courts - Baker County

  • Courthouse:

    Baker County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Baker, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASON, JODI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIDELITY BANK DBA FIDELITY BAN

Defendants

JENNIFER J CRUMMEY AKA JENNIFE

SANDRA ELIZABETH GRIFFIS

JAMES D CRUMMEY AKA JAMES DAVI

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SANDRA ELIZA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANTHOUSIS, JULIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2019
  • Payment received: $959.00 Receipt Number MX 2019003128

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $959.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $959.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Judge: CASON , JODI Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED UNK SPOUSE OF SANDRA E GRIFFIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED SANDRA ELIZABETH GRIFFIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED JAMES D CRUMMEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED JENNIFER J CRUMMEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS #201900004140

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Case 022019CA000065CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/5/2019

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.