This case was last updated from Baker County Courts on 02/09/2021 at 13:51:35 (UTC).

CREWS, ANNDREA VS CREWS, STEPHEN

Case Summary

On 02/28/2020 CREWS, ANNDREA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CREWS, STEPHEN. This case was filed in Baker County Courts, Baker County Courthouse located in Baker, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALKER, GLORIMIL ROSARIO, GLORIA WALKER and WALKER, GLORIA R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Baker, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALKER, GLORIMIL ROSARIO

GLORIA WALKER

WALKER, GLORIA R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CREWS, ANNDREA

Respondent

CREWS, STEPHEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRAIGE WITH DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketORDER FOR HEARING TO PROCEED BY VIDEO CONFERENCE ON 05/21/2020 AT 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketEvent Time Changed:Family Court set for 5/21/2020 at 0100 PM in MX with Judge GLORIA WALKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketEvent Court - Family scheduled on 5/21/2020 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge GLORIA WALKER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING ON 05/21/2020 AT 1:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketCHILD SUPPORT G/LINES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketDesignation of Email HUSBAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketDesignation of Email WIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketPARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT WIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketHUSBAND/WIFE PROOF OF IDENTITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number MX 2020001154

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketCase 022020DR000079DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketJudge: WALKER , GLORIA R assigned

    Read MoreRead Less