This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Baker County on 06/25/2019 at 16:00:33 (UTC).

COMPU LINK CORPORATION OF MI VS CROSIER, JEREMY Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/11/2019 COMPU LINK CORPORATION OF MI filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CROSIER, JEREMY. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Baker County, Baker County Courthouse located in Baker, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASON, JODI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Eighth Circuit Courts - Baker County

  • Courthouse:

    Baker County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Baker, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASON, JODI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMPU LINK CORPORATION OF MI

Defendants

CROSIER, UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JER

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTIN

TENANT 1, UNKNOWN

CROSIER, JEREMY

TENANT 2, UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHIN-DUNCAN, KARISSA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2019
  • Payment received: $968.00 Receipt Number MX 2019003164

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $968.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $968.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Judge: CASON , JODI Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED UNK TENANT #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED UNK TENANT #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED USA SECTRETARY OF HOUSING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED UNK SPOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED JEREMY CROSIER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS #201900004135

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Sworn Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Case 022019CA000066CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less