This case was last updated from Baker County Courts on 02/09/2021 at 14:15:10 (UTC).

COLLINS, AMY F VS COLLINS, JOHN G

Case Summary

On 04/16/2020 COLLINS, AMY F filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against COLLINS, JOHN G. This case was filed in Baker County Courts, Baker County Courthouse located in Baker, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GLORIA WALKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Baker, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GLORIA WALKER

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COLLINS, AMY F

Respondent

COLLINS, JOHN G

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

FISH, HUGH DORSEY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketORDER FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketEvent Court - Family scheduled on 11/10/2020 at 0100 PM, MX - Judge GLORIA WALKER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE - TUESDAY, 11/10/2020 1:00PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketOther - WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - HUSBAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketOther PARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate OF COURSE COMPLETION - AMY COLLINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate OF COURSE COMPLETION - GRANT COLLINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketOther WAIVER OF RIGHT TO THIRY DAY NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketOther MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketPetition FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number MX 2020001910

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $408.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketCase 022020DR000131DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FISH, HUGH DORSEY