This case was last updated from Baker County Courts on 09/14/2020 at 09:41:12 (UTC).

COLEMAN, SANCHEZ LAMAR VS COLEMAN, CRYSTAL

Case Summary

On 06/11/2020 COLEMAN, SANCHEZ LAMAR filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against COLEMAN, CRYSTAL. This case was filed in Baker County Courts, Baker County Courthouse located in Baker, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WALKER, GLORIMIL ROSARIO and WALKER, GLORIA R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Baker, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WALKER, GLORIMIL ROSARIO

WALKER, GLORIA R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COLEMAN, SANCHEZ LAMAR

Respondent

COLEMAN, CRYSTAL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketORDER FOR REFERRAL TO MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketPERMISSION TO USE E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketPARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CHILDREN BORN/NOT BORN DURING THE MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT SANCHEZ COLEMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $418.00 Balance Remaining $418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketCase 022020DR000176DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketJudge: WALKER , GLORIA R assigned

    Read MoreRead Less