This case was last updated from Baker County Courts on 02/04/2021 at 16:31:48 (UTC).

ANDERSON, TERRY Et Al VS PERRY, DARRYL GLEN JR

Case Summary

On 06/23/2020 ANDERSON, TERRY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PERRY, DARRYL GLEN JR. This case was filed in Baker County Courts, Baker County Courthouse located in Baker, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JOSEPH WILLIAMS, WILLIAMS, JOSEPH MICHAEL and WILLIAMS, JOSEPH M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Baker, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JOSEPH WILLIAMS

WILLIAMS, JOSEPH MICHAEL

WILLIAMS, JOSEPH M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANDERSON, TERRY

BARNARD, JODY

Defendant

PERRY, DARRYL GLEN JR

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/23/2020:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS ISSUED DARRYL GLEN PERRY JR

06/26/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED DARRYL GLEN PERRY JR

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - UNEXECUTED- DARRYL GLEN PERRY JR- NOT FOUND- 08/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 08/04/2020 09:55; Judge: WILLIAMS, JOSEPH M; Docket Type: PreTrial - SC; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE FROM TERRY ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketNOTICE CHANGING IN-PERSON HEARING TO REMOTE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED DARRYL GLEN PERRY JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketActive Process SUMMON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketEvent Time Changed:PreTrial - SC set for 8/4/2020 at 0955 AM in MX with Judge JOSEPH WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketEvent PreTrial - SC scheduled on 8/4/2020 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge JOSEPH WILLIAMS presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 2020002792

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $175.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketCase 022020SC000192SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketJudge: WILLIAMS , JOSEPH M assigned

    Read MoreRead Less