Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/09/2020 at 02:11:16 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA -VS- WRIGHT, RICHARD DEXTER

Case Summary

On 11/04/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WRIGHT, RICHARD DEXTER. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVIS, WILLIAM E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***************35 A

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVIS, WILLIAM E

 

Party Details

Defendants

WRIGHT, RICHARD DEXTER

Gainesville, FL 32641

WRIGHT, RICHARD

Gainesville, FL 32641

Not Yet Classified

KING, BROOKE

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

LIMOGE, VALERIE L

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Not Yet Classified Attorney

KING, BROOKE

120 W. University Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

12/28/2017: CASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

RELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

12/18/2017: RELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

EMAIL

12/15/2017: EMAIL

ORDER RELEASING DEFENDANT ON RECOGNIZANCE // GREEN

12/15/2017: ORDER RELEASING DEFENDANT ON RECOGNIZANCE // GREEN

COURT ACTION MEMO

12/15/2017: COURT ACTION MEMO

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/14/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION TO RELEASE DEFENDANT ON HIS OWN RECOGNIZANCE PURSUANT TO RULE 3.134 FRCrP

12/14/2017: MOTION TO RELEASE DEFENDANT ON HIS OWN RECOGNIZANCE PURSUANT TO RULE 3.134 FRCrP

DECLINATION OF PROSECUTION AFFIDAVIT

12/06/2017: DECLINATION OF PROSECUTION AFFIDAVIT

ORDER ON MOTION TO REDUCE BOND//MOSELEY

11/20/2017: ORDER ON MOTION TO REDUCE BOND//MOSELEY

COURT ACTION MEMO

11/20/2017: COURT ACTION MEMO

MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

11/15/2017: MOTION FOR BOND REDUCTION

EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

11/14/2017: EMAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

11/08/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

11/08/2017: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

11/08/2017: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

11/05/2017: STANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

11/05/2017: FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

ARREST FORM

11/05/2017: ARREST FORM

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2017
  • ChargeBATTERY: COMMIT DOMESTIC BATTERY BY STRANGULATION; Charge: 1; Phase: PROS; Disposition: NO INFO INSUFFICIENT EVIDENCE THIS DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ACTION REPORT: NOLLE/NO INFO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketOBTS PRE-COURT ENTRY; Count: 1; PROSECUTOR PHASE; Charge Status: Same; Final Decision Date: 12/28/2017; Final Action: I1 NO INFO INSUFFICIENT EVIDENCE THIS DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRELEASED ON RECOGNIZANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER RELEASING DEFENDANT ON RECOGNIZANCE // MOSELEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER RELEASING DEFENDANT ON RECOGNIZANCE // GREEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ACTION MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO RELEASE DEFENDANT ON HIS OWN RECOGNIZANCE PURSUANT TO RULE 3.134 FRCrP

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketASSESSMENT - CF $50 INDIGENCE APPLICATION FEE; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS (INDIGENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING NO CONTACT ORDER PER AO 4.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2017
  • DocketPROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2017
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE CRIMINAL HISTORY; SUMMARY - SEE LAST PAGE OF FIRST APPEARANCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE ORDER; - REVIEW *LINDAS* SYSTEM FOR ALL CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $50.00; Total Fee Paid: $0.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $50.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KING, BROOKE